House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dagmara Avelar | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |