House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | To Revenue - Tax Credit and Incentives Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Norine K. Hammond | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |