House | 12/18/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr | ||
House | 12/15/2023 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr | ||
House | 12/15/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Assigned to Human Services Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |