House
|
07/10/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0649
|
|
|
House
|
07/10/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
07/10/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 072-035-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 072-035-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Insurance Committee; 010-005-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Insurance Committee; 010-005-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 040-019-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 007-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/10/2023
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2023
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 4, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities; 006-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 23, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted - Referred to Floor
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|