House | 06/29/2024 | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/18/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Assigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee | ||
House | 06/26/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |