House
|
08/11/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0533
|
|
|
House
|
08/11/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
08/11/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-001
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Sponsor Removed Sen. Omar Aquino
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Do Pass Executive; 011-000-001
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Waive Posting Notice
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Sponsor Removed Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 082-031-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 007-003-002
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Third Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|