House
|
03/27/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|