House | 05/21/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch | ||
House | 06/26/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |