House
|
07/28/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0316
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Effective Date July 28, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 101-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 017-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Energy & Environment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Do Pass Local Government; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 024-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.
|
|
|