Illinois 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Illinois House Bill HB2527 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/25/2023

                    HB2527 EnrolledLRB103 25921 AWJ 52272 b   HB2527 Enrolled  LRB103 25921 AWJ 52272 b
  HB2527 Enrolled  LRB103 25921 AWJ 52272 b
1  AN ACT concerning local government.
2  Be it enacted by the People of the State of Illinois,
3  represented in the General Assembly:
4  Section 5. The Illinois Municipal Code is amended by
5  changing Section 8-4-27 as follows:
6  (65 ILCS 5/8-4-27)
7  (Section scheduled to be repealed on January 1, 2024)
8  Sec. 8-4-27. Municipal Water and Wastewater Funding Study
9  Committee.
10  (a) The Municipal Water and Wastewater Funding Study
11  Committee is established.
12  (b) The Committee shall be comprised of the following
13  members, and the appointed members of the Committee shall be
14  appointed to the Committee no later than 30 days after May 13,
15  2022 (the effective date of Public Act 102-865) this
16  amendatory Act of the 102nd General Assembly:
17  (1) 1) The Governor, or his or her designee, who shall
18  serve as chairperson.
19  (2) The Director of the Illinois Environmental
20  Protection Agency, or his or her designee.
21  (3) The Executive Director of the Illinois Finance
22  Authority, or his or her designee.
23  (4) (3) One member appointed by the President of the

 

  HB2527 Enrolled  LRB103 25921 AWJ 52272 b


HB2527 Enrolled- 2 -LRB103 25921 AWJ 52272 b   HB2527 Enrolled - 2 - LRB103 25921 AWJ 52272 b
  HB2527 Enrolled - 2 - LRB103 25921 AWJ 52272 b
1  Senate.
2  (5) (4) One member appointed by the Minority Leader of
3  the Senate.
4  (6) (5) One member appointed by the Speaker of the
5  House of Representatives.
6  (7) (6) One member appointed by the Minority Leader of
7  the House of Representatives.
8  (8) (7) Members appointed by the Director of the
9  Illinois Environmental Protection Agency as follows:
10  (A) one member who is a representative of a
11  publicly owned publicly-owned drinking water or
12  wastewater utility with a service population of 25,000
13  or less;
14  (B) one member who is a representative of a
15  publicly owned publicly-owned drinking water or
16  wastewater utility with a service population over
17  25,000 people to 125,000 people;
18  (C) one member who is a representative of a
19  publicly owned publicly-owned drinking water or
20  wastewater utility with a service population over
21  125,000 people;
22  (D) one member who is a representative of a
23  statewide organization representing wastewater
24  agencies; and
25  (E) one member who is a representative of a
26  statewide organization representing drinking water

 

 

  HB2527 Enrolled - 2 - LRB103 25921 AWJ 52272 b


HB2527 Enrolled- 3 -LRB103 25921 AWJ 52272 b   HB2527 Enrolled - 3 - LRB103 25921 AWJ 52272 b
  HB2527 Enrolled - 3 - LRB103 25921 AWJ 52272 b
1  agencies.
2  The Committee shall meet at the call of the chair. Committee
3  members shall serve without compensation. If a vacancy occurs
4  in the Committee membership, the vacancy shall be filled in
5  the same manner as the original appointment for the remainder
6  of the Committee.
7  (c) The Committee shall study and make recommendations
8  concerning any needed modifications to Illinois Environmental
9  Protection Agency and Illinois Pollution Control Board
10  regulations and policies as they relate to municipal water and
11  wastewater funding to ensure that the State's revolving loan
12  fund programs account for and prioritize the following
13  principles, to the fullest extent allowed by federal law:
14  (1) A community shall not be deemed ineligible for
15  disadvantaged community status based on size or service
16  area of any size, with regard to special rates, loan
17  terms, and eligibility for loan or grant funds.
18  (2) In determining whether a community is
19  disadvantaged, consideration should be given to impacts of
20  funding on water and wastewater expenses for low-income
21  populations.
22  (3) In determining whether a community is eligible for
23  funds and special rates or loan terms, environmental
24  justice concepts should be considered.
25  (4) In determining how funding is allocated, a
26  community facing water supply shortages should be

 

 

  HB2527 Enrolled - 3 - LRB103 25921 AWJ 52272 b


HB2527 Enrolled- 4 -LRB103 25921 AWJ 52272 b   HB2527 Enrolled - 4 - LRB103 25921 AWJ 52272 b
  HB2527 Enrolled - 4 - LRB103 25921 AWJ 52272 b
1  considered a high priority based on urgency of need.
2  (5) The funding programs should promote formation and
3  implementation of regional water partnerships.
4  (6) Targeted funding should be provided for addressing
5  emerging contaminants, including PFAS.
6  (7) In determining eligibility for assistance, the
7  role that the State revolving fund programs play for small
8  communities should be understood and fully considered.
9  (8) Any recommendations for changes to the programs
10  must be fully consistent with federal law and must not
11  adversely affect any community's eligibility for loans
12  under federal law.
13  (d) The Committee shall prepare a report that summarizes
14  its work and makes recommendations resulting from its study.
15  The Committee shall submit the report of its findings and
16  recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly no
17  later than March 1, 2024 January 31, 2023. Once the Committee
18  has submitted the report to the General Assembly and Governor,
19  the Committee is dissolved.
20  (e) (f) This Section is repealed on January 1, 2025 2024.
21  (Source: P.A. 102-865, eff. 5-13-22; revised 8-23-22.)
22  Section 99. Effective date. This Act takes effect upon
23  becoming law.

 

 

  HB2527 Enrolled - 4 - LRB103 25921 AWJ 52272 b