House
|
08/04/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0435
|
|
|
House
|
08/04/2023
|
Effective Date August 4, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
08/04/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 047-006-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Do Pass Higher Education; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Higher Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-005-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Higher Education Committee; 015-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|