House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr. | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | To Revenue - Property Tax Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dagmara Avelar |