House
|
07/28/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0317
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 033-020-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 4, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Do Pass Executive; 010-003-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 072-040-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William "Will" Davis
|
|
|