House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | To Commercial & Property Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass |