Senate | 05/05/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 04/28/2023 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 6, 2023 | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Assigned to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Arrive in Senate | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Do Pass / Short Debate Police & Fire Committee; 013-000-000 | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Police & Fire Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joyce Mason |