House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kevin John Olickal | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kevin John Olickal |