Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Postponed - Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/06/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 069-037-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 018-009-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 018-010-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|