Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Appropriations- Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 072-036-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 006-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 005-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|