House
|
06/30/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0161
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 2, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 27, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Do Pass Judiciary; 007-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 070-037-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Housing; 010-005-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Housing
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Housing
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Housing; 010-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Housing
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|