House | 03/10/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |