House | 05/16/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella | ||
House | 05/15/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas | ||
House | 05/12/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Executive Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |