House
|
06/30/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0162
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 8, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Do Pass Transportation; 017-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Erica Harriss
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Bennett
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dan Caulkins
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis Tipsword, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bradley Fritts
|
|
|