LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Illinois IL
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB2721
Action History
IL
Illinois House Bill HB2721
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Illinois 2023-2024 Regular Session
Illinois House Bill HB2721
Action History
House
07/17/2023
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
House
03/21/2023
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
House
02/27/2023
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
House
02/16/2023
Referred to Rules Committee
House
02/16/2023
First Reading
House
02/15/2023
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dagmara Avelar