House
|
10/01/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Housing; 010-005-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Housing
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Housing; 012-006-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Housing
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jed Davis
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jed Davis
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|