House
|
06/09/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0039
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Do Pass Licensed Activities; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-007-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 007-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|