Senate | 03/27/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 24, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Arrive in Senate | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-002-000 | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 015-000-000 | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |