House
|
06/30/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0167
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Effective Date June 30, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 114-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 022-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Energy & Environment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 8, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Environment and Conservation; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Environment and Conservation
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Postponed - Environment and Conservation
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Environment and Conservation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dave Severin
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 023-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 017-010-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|