House | 05/19/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023 | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Assigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William "Will" Davis |