House | 03/14/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Justin Slaughter | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |