House
|
04/30/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Mental Health & Addiction Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Mental Health & Addiction Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Mental Health & Addiction Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Mental Health & Addiction Committee; 020-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Mental Health & Addiction Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|