Senate
|
12/10/2023
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/06/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 7, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/06/2023
|
Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Do Pass State Government; 006-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|