House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | To Special Issues Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Assigned to Human Services Committee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | To Medicaid Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Human Services Committee | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |