House | 03/10/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Energy & Environment Committee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Severin | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Severin |