House | 05/19/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023 | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |