Illinois 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Illinois House Bill HB2873 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/16/2023

                    103RD GENERAL ASSEMBLY State of Illinois 2023 and 2024 HB2873 Introduced , by Rep. Rita Mayfield SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED:   40 ILCS 5/16-118 from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 16-118   Amends the Downstate Teacher Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that beginning July 1, 2023, an annuitant may accept employment as a teacher without impairing his or her retirement status if that employment is not within the school year during which service was terminated and does not exceed 150 (instead of 100) paid days or 750 (instead of 500) paid hours in each school year. Effective immediately.  LRB103 30037 RPS 56458 b   A BILL FOR 103RD GENERAL ASSEMBLY State of Illinois 2023 and 2024 HB2873 Introduced , by Rep. Rita Mayfield SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED:  40 ILCS 5/16-118 from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 16-118 40 ILCS 5/16-118 from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 16-118 Amends the Downstate Teacher Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that beginning July 1, 2023, an annuitant may accept employment as a teacher without impairing his or her retirement status if that employment is not within the school year during which service was terminated and does not exceed 150 (instead of 100) paid days or 750 (instead of 500) paid hours in each school year. Effective immediately.  LRB103 30037 RPS 56458 b     LRB103 30037 RPS 56458 b   A BILL FOR
103RD GENERAL ASSEMBLY State of Illinois 2023 and 2024 HB2873 Introduced , by Rep. Rita Mayfield SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED:
40 ILCS 5/16-118 from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 16-118 40 ILCS 5/16-118 from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 16-118
40 ILCS 5/16-118 from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 16-118
Amends the Downstate Teacher Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that beginning July 1, 2023, an annuitant may accept employment as a teacher without impairing his or her retirement status if that employment is not within the school year during which service was terminated and does not exceed 150 (instead of 100) paid days or 750 (instead of 500) paid hours in each school year. Effective immediately.
LRB103 30037 RPS 56458 b     LRB103 30037 RPS 56458 b
    LRB103 30037 RPS 56458 b
A BILL FOR
HB2873LRB103 30037 RPS 56458 b   HB2873  LRB103 30037 RPS 56458 b
  HB2873  LRB103 30037 RPS 56458 b
1  AN ACT concerning public employee benefits.
2  Be it enacted by the People of the State of Illinois,
3  represented in the General Assembly:
4  Section 5. The Illinois Pension Code is amended by
5  changing Section 16-118 as follows:
6  (40 ILCS 5/16-118) (from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 16-118)
7  Sec. 16-118. Retirement. "Retirement": Entry upon a
8  retirement annuity or receipt of a single-sum retirement
9  benefit granted under this Article after termination of active
10  service as a teacher.
11  (a) An annuitant receiving a retirement annuity other than
12  a disability retirement annuity may accept employment as a
13  teacher from a school board or other employer specified in
14  Section 16-106 without impairing retirement status, if that
15  employment:
16  (1) is not within the school year during which service
17  was terminated; and
18  (2) does not exceed the following:
19  (i) before July 1, 2001, 100 paid days or 500 paid
20  hours in any school year;
21  (ii) during the period beginning July 1, 2001
22  through June 30, 2011, 120 paid days or 600 paid hours
23  in each school year;

 

103RD GENERAL ASSEMBLY State of Illinois 2023 and 2024 HB2873 Introduced , by Rep. Rita Mayfield SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED:
40 ILCS 5/16-118 from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 16-118 40 ILCS 5/16-118 from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 16-118
40 ILCS 5/16-118 from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 16-118
Amends the Downstate Teacher Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that beginning July 1, 2023, an annuitant may accept employment as a teacher without impairing his or her retirement status if that employment is not within the school year during which service was terminated and does not exceed 150 (instead of 100) paid days or 750 (instead of 500) paid hours in each school year. Effective immediately.
LRB103 30037 RPS 56458 b     LRB103 30037 RPS 56458 b
    LRB103 30037 RPS 56458 b
A BILL FOR

 

 

40 ILCS 5/16-118 from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 16-118



    LRB103 30037 RPS 56458 b

 

 



 

  HB2873  LRB103 30037 RPS 56458 b


HB2873- 2 -LRB103 30037 RPS 56458 b   HB2873 - 2 - LRB103 30037 RPS 56458 b
  HB2873 - 2 - LRB103 30037 RPS 56458 b
1  (iii) during the period beginning July 1, 2011
2  through June 30, 2018, 100 paid days or 500 paid hours
3  in each school year;
4  (iv) beginning July 1, 2018 through June 30, 2023,
5  120 paid days or 600 paid hours in each school year,
6  but not more than 100 paid days in the same classroom;
7  (v) during the period between July 1, 2021 and
8  June 30, 2022, an additional 20 paid days or 100 paid
9  hours shall be added to item (iv) of this paragraph (2)
10  to assist with addressing the substitute teacher
11  shortage that has been exacerbated by the ongoing
12  global pandemic; and
13  (vi) beginning July 1, 2023, 150 100 paid days or
14  750 500 paid hours in each school year.
15  Where such permitted employment is partly on a daily and
16  partly on an hourly basis, a day shall be considered as 5
17  hours.
18  (b) Subsection (a) does not apply to an annuitant who
19  returns to teaching under the program established in Section
20  16-150.1, for the duration of his or her participation in that
21  program.
22  (Source: P.A. 101-645, eff. 6-26-20; 102-537, eff. 8-20-21;
23  102-709, eff. 4-22-22.)
24  Section 99. Effective date. This Act takes effect upon
25  becoming law.

 

 

  HB2873 - 2 - LRB103 30037 RPS 56458 b