1 | 1 | | 103RD GENERAL ASSEMBLY State of Illinois 2023 and 2024 HB2873 Introduced , by Rep. Rita Mayfield SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED: 40 ILCS 5/16-118 from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 16-118 Amends the Downstate Teacher Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that beginning July 1, 2023, an annuitant may accept employment as a teacher without impairing his or her retirement status if that employment is not within the school year during which service was terminated and does not exceed 150 (instead of 100) paid days or 750 (instead of 500) paid hours in each school year. Effective immediately. LRB103 30037 RPS 56458 b A BILL FOR 103RD GENERAL ASSEMBLY State of Illinois 2023 and 2024 HB2873 Introduced , by Rep. Rita Mayfield SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED: 40 ILCS 5/16-118 from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 16-118 40 ILCS 5/16-118 from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 16-118 Amends the Downstate Teacher Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that beginning July 1, 2023, an annuitant may accept employment as a teacher without impairing his or her retirement status if that employment is not within the school year during which service was terminated and does not exceed 150 (instead of 100) paid days or 750 (instead of 500) paid hours in each school year. Effective immediately. LRB103 30037 RPS 56458 b LRB103 30037 RPS 56458 b A BILL FOR |
---|
2 | 2 | | 103RD GENERAL ASSEMBLY State of Illinois 2023 and 2024 HB2873 Introduced , by Rep. Rita Mayfield SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED: |
---|
3 | 3 | | 40 ILCS 5/16-118 from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 16-118 40 ILCS 5/16-118 from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 16-118 |
---|
4 | 4 | | 40 ILCS 5/16-118 from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 16-118 |
---|
5 | 5 | | Amends the Downstate Teacher Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that beginning July 1, 2023, an annuitant may accept employment as a teacher without impairing his or her retirement status if that employment is not within the school year during which service was terminated and does not exceed 150 (instead of 100) paid days or 750 (instead of 500) paid hours in each school year. Effective immediately. |
---|
6 | 6 | | LRB103 30037 RPS 56458 b LRB103 30037 RPS 56458 b |
---|
7 | 7 | | LRB103 30037 RPS 56458 b |
---|
8 | 8 | | A BILL FOR |
---|
9 | 9 | | HB2873LRB103 30037 RPS 56458 b HB2873 LRB103 30037 RPS 56458 b |
---|
10 | 10 | | HB2873 LRB103 30037 RPS 56458 b |
---|
11 | 11 | | 1 AN ACT concerning public employee benefits. |
---|
12 | 12 | | 2 Be it enacted by the People of the State of Illinois, |
---|
13 | 13 | | 3 represented in the General Assembly: |
---|
14 | 14 | | 4 Section 5. The Illinois Pension Code is amended by |
---|
15 | 15 | | 5 changing Section 16-118 as follows: |
---|
16 | 16 | | 6 (40 ILCS 5/16-118) (from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 16-118) |
---|
17 | 17 | | 7 Sec. 16-118. Retirement. "Retirement": Entry upon a |
---|
18 | 18 | | 8 retirement annuity or receipt of a single-sum retirement |
---|
19 | 19 | | 9 benefit granted under this Article after termination of active |
---|
20 | 20 | | 10 service as a teacher. |
---|
21 | 21 | | 11 (a) An annuitant receiving a retirement annuity other than |
---|
22 | 22 | | 12 a disability retirement annuity may accept employment as a |
---|
23 | 23 | | 13 teacher from a school board or other employer specified in |
---|
24 | 24 | | 14 Section 16-106 without impairing retirement status, if that |
---|
25 | 25 | | 15 employment: |
---|
26 | 26 | | 16 (1) is not within the school year during which service |
---|
27 | 27 | | 17 was terminated; and |
---|
28 | 28 | | 18 (2) does not exceed the following: |
---|
29 | 29 | | 19 (i) before July 1, 2001, 100 paid days or 500 paid |
---|
30 | 30 | | 20 hours in any school year; |
---|
31 | 31 | | 21 (ii) during the period beginning July 1, 2001 |
---|
32 | 32 | | 22 through June 30, 2011, 120 paid days or 600 paid hours |
---|
33 | 33 | | 23 in each school year; |
---|
34 | 34 | | |
---|
35 | 35 | | |
---|
36 | 36 | | |
---|
37 | 37 | | 103RD GENERAL ASSEMBLY State of Illinois 2023 and 2024 HB2873 Introduced , by Rep. Rita Mayfield SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED: |
---|
38 | 38 | | 40 ILCS 5/16-118 from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 16-118 40 ILCS 5/16-118 from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 16-118 |
---|
39 | 39 | | 40 ILCS 5/16-118 from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 16-118 |
---|
40 | 40 | | Amends the Downstate Teacher Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that beginning July 1, 2023, an annuitant may accept employment as a teacher without impairing his or her retirement status if that employment is not within the school year during which service was terminated and does not exceed 150 (instead of 100) paid days or 750 (instead of 500) paid hours in each school year. Effective immediately. |
---|
41 | 41 | | LRB103 30037 RPS 56458 b LRB103 30037 RPS 56458 b |
---|
42 | 42 | | LRB103 30037 RPS 56458 b |
---|
43 | 43 | | A BILL FOR |
---|
44 | 44 | | |
---|
45 | 45 | | |
---|
46 | 46 | | |
---|
47 | 47 | | |
---|
48 | 48 | | |
---|
49 | 49 | | 40 ILCS 5/16-118 from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 16-118 |
---|
50 | 50 | | |
---|
51 | 51 | | |
---|
52 | 52 | | |
---|
53 | 53 | | LRB103 30037 RPS 56458 b |
---|
54 | 54 | | |
---|
55 | 55 | | |
---|
56 | 56 | | |
---|
57 | 57 | | |
---|
58 | 58 | | |
---|
59 | 59 | | |
---|
60 | 60 | | |
---|
61 | 61 | | |
---|
62 | 62 | | |
---|
63 | 63 | | HB2873 LRB103 30037 RPS 56458 b |
---|
64 | 64 | | |
---|
65 | 65 | | |
---|
66 | 66 | | HB2873- 2 -LRB103 30037 RPS 56458 b HB2873 - 2 - LRB103 30037 RPS 56458 b |
---|
67 | 67 | | HB2873 - 2 - LRB103 30037 RPS 56458 b |
---|
68 | 68 | | 1 (iii) during the period beginning July 1, 2011 |
---|
69 | 69 | | 2 through June 30, 2018, 100 paid days or 500 paid hours |
---|
70 | 70 | | 3 in each school year; |
---|
71 | 71 | | 4 (iv) beginning July 1, 2018 through June 30, 2023, |
---|
72 | 72 | | 5 120 paid days or 600 paid hours in each school year, |
---|
73 | 73 | | 6 but not more than 100 paid days in the same classroom; |
---|
74 | 74 | | 7 (v) during the period between July 1, 2021 and |
---|
75 | 75 | | 8 June 30, 2022, an additional 20 paid days or 100 paid |
---|
76 | 76 | | 9 hours shall be added to item (iv) of this paragraph (2) |
---|
77 | 77 | | 10 to assist with addressing the substitute teacher |
---|
78 | 78 | | 11 shortage that has been exacerbated by the ongoing |
---|
79 | 79 | | 12 global pandemic; and |
---|
80 | 80 | | 13 (vi) beginning July 1, 2023, 150 100 paid days or |
---|
81 | 81 | | 14 750 500 paid hours in each school year. |
---|
82 | 82 | | 15 Where such permitted employment is partly on a daily and |
---|
83 | 83 | | 16 partly on an hourly basis, a day shall be considered as 5 |
---|
84 | 84 | | 17 hours. |
---|
85 | 85 | | 18 (b) Subsection (a) does not apply to an annuitant who |
---|
86 | 86 | | 19 returns to teaching under the program established in Section |
---|
87 | 87 | | 20 16-150.1, for the duration of his or her participation in that |
---|
88 | 88 | | 21 program. |
---|
89 | 89 | | 22 (Source: P.A. 101-645, eff. 6-26-20; 102-537, eff. 8-20-21; |
---|
90 | 90 | | 23 102-709, eff. 4-22-22.) |
---|
91 | 91 | | 24 Section 99. Effective date. This Act takes effect upon |
---|
92 | 92 | | 25 becoming law. |
---|
93 | 93 | | |
---|
94 | 94 | | |
---|
95 | 95 | | |
---|
96 | 96 | | |
---|
97 | 97 | | |
---|
98 | 98 | | HB2873 - 2 - LRB103 30037 RPS 56458 b |
---|