House
|
08/03/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0412
|
|
|
House
|
08/03/2023
|
Effective Date August 3, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
08/03/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 8, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|