House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | To Revenue - Property Tax Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lakesia Collins |