House
|
08/11/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0536
|
|
|
House
|
08/11/2023
|
Effective Date August 11, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
08/11/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 055-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Do Pass Higher Education; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Waive Posting Notice
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Assigned to Higher Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Third Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William "Will" Davis
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 008-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Higher Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|