House | 03/27/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 011-000-000 | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; by Voice Vote | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |