Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-001-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William "Will" Davis
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Appropriations-Higher Education Committee; 009-005-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Appropriations-Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-assigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|