House | 03/23/2023 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 006-097-001 | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges; 016-000-000 | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jawaharial Williams | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Assigned to Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jawaharial Williams |