House | 04/05/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 To Revenue - Property Tax Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | To Revenue - Property Tax Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | To Revenue - Property Tax Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock |