House | 06/12/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | To Revenue - Property Tax Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Steven Reick |