House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Swanson |