House
|
08/11/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0537
|
|
|
House
|
08/11/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
08/11/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Do Pass Licensed Activities; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 090-014-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|