House
|
08/04/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0439
|
|
|
House
|
08/04/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
08/04/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 2, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 27, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dan Ugaste
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|