House | 03/29/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William E Hauter | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr. | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bradley Fritts |