House
|
06/30/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0174
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Effective Date June 30, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 8, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Do Pass Local Government; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis Tipsword, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 010-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer
|
|
|