103RD GENERAL ASSEMBLY State of Illinois 2023 and 2024 HB2979 Introduced , by Rep. Adam M. Niemerg SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED: 35 ILCS 5/204 from Ch. 120, par. 2-204 Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Increases the standard exemption to $150,000. Effective immediately. LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b A BILL FOR 103RD GENERAL ASSEMBLY State of Illinois 2023 and 2024 HB2979 Introduced , by Rep. Adam M. Niemerg SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED: 35 ILCS 5/204 from Ch. 120, par. 2-204 35 ILCS 5/204 from Ch. 120, par. 2-204 Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Increases the standard exemption to $150,000. Effective immediately. LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b A BILL FOR 103RD GENERAL ASSEMBLY State of Illinois 2023 and 2024 HB2979 Introduced , by Rep. Adam M. Niemerg SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED: 35 ILCS 5/204 from Ch. 120, par. 2-204 35 ILCS 5/204 from Ch. 120, par. 2-204 35 ILCS 5/204 from Ch. 120, par. 2-204 Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Increases the standard exemption to $150,000. Effective immediately. LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b A BILL FOR HB2979LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b HB2979 LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b HB2979 LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b 1 AN ACT concerning revenue. 2 Be it enacted by the People of the State of Illinois, 3 represented in the General Assembly: 4 Section 5. The Illinois Income Tax Act is amended by 5 changing Section 204 as follows: 6 (35 ILCS 5/204) (from Ch. 120, par. 2-204) 7 Sec. 204. Standard exemption. 8 (a) Allowance of exemption. In computing net income under 9 this Act, there shall be allowed as an exemption the sum of the 10 amounts determined under subsections (b), (c) and (d), 11 multiplied by a fraction the numerator of which is the amount 12 of the taxpayer's base income allocable to this State for the 13 taxable year and the denominator of which is the taxpayer's 14 total base income for the taxable year. 15 (b) Basic amount. For the purpose of subsection (a) of 16 this Section, except as provided by subsection (a) of Section 17 205 and in this subsection, each taxpayer shall be allowed a 18 basic amount of $1000, except that for corporations the basic 19 amount shall be zero for tax years ending on or after December 20 31, 2003, and for individuals the basic amount shall be: 21 (1) for taxable years ending on or after December 31, 22 1998 and prior to December 31, 1999, $1,300; 23 (2) for taxable years ending on or after December 31, 103RD GENERAL ASSEMBLY State of Illinois 2023 and 2024 HB2979 Introduced , by Rep. Adam M. Niemerg SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED: 35 ILCS 5/204 from Ch. 120, par. 2-204 35 ILCS 5/204 from Ch. 120, par. 2-204 35 ILCS 5/204 from Ch. 120, par. 2-204 Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Increases the standard exemption to $150,000. Effective immediately. LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b A BILL FOR 35 ILCS 5/204 from Ch. 120, par. 2-204 LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b HB2979 LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b HB2979- 2 -LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b HB2979 - 2 - LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b HB2979 - 2 - LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b 1 1999 and prior to December 31, 2000, $1,650; 2 (3) for taxable years ending on or after December 31, 3 2000 and prior to December 31, 2012, $2,000; 4 (4) for taxable years ending on or after December 31, 5 2012 and prior to December 31, 2013, $2,050; 6 (5) for taxable years ending on or after December 31, 7 2013 and on or before December 31, 2023, $2,050 plus the 8 cost-of-living adjustment under subsection (d-5); and . 9 (6) for taxable years ending after December 31, 2023, 10 $150,000. 11 For taxable years ending on or after December 31, 1992, a 12 taxpayer whose Illinois base income exceeds the basic amount 13 and who is claimed as a dependent on another person's tax 14 return under the Internal Revenue Code shall not be allowed 15 any basic amount under this subsection. 16 (c) Additional amount for individuals. In the case of an 17 individual taxpayer, there shall be allowed for the purpose of 18 subsection (a), in addition to the basic amount provided by 19 subsection (b), an additional exemption equal to the basic 20 amount for each exemption in excess of one allowable to such 21 individual taxpayer for the taxable year under Section 151 of 22 the Internal Revenue Code. 23 (d) Additional exemptions for an individual taxpayer and 24 his or her spouse. In the case of an individual taxpayer and 25 his or her spouse, he or she shall each be allowed additional 26 exemptions as follows: HB2979 - 2 - LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b HB2979- 3 -LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b HB2979 - 3 - LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b HB2979 - 3 - LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b 1 (1) Additional exemption for taxpayer or spouse 65 2 years of age or older. 3 (A) For taxpayer. An additional exemption of 4 $1,000 for the taxpayer if he or she has attained the 5 age of 65 before the end of the taxable year. 6 (B) For spouse when a joint return is not filed. An 7 additional exemption of $1,000 for the spouse of the 8 taxpayer if a joint return is not made by the taxpayer 9 and his spouse, and if the spouse has attained the age 10 of 65 before the end of such taxable year, and, for the 11 calendar year in which the taxable year of the 12 taxpayer begins, has no gross income and is not the 13 dependent of another taxpayer. 14 (2) Additional exemption for blindness of taxpayer or 15 spouse. 16 (A) For taxpayer. An additional exemption of 17 $1,000 for the taxpayer if he or she is blind at the 18 end of the taxable year. 19 (B) For spouse when a joint return is not filed. An 20 additional exemption of $1,000 for the spouse of the 21 taxpayer if a separate return is made by the taxpayer, 22 and if the spouse is blind and, for the calendar year 23 in which the taxable year of the taxpayer begins, has 24 no gross income and is not the dependent of another 25 taxpayer. For purposes of this paragraph, the 26 determination of whether the spouse is blind shall be HB2979 - 3 - LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b HB2979- 4 -LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b HB2979 - 4 - LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b HB2979 - 4 - LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b 1 made as of the end of the taxable year of the taxpayer; 2 except that if the spouse dies during such taxable 3 year such determination shall be made as of the time of 4 such death. 5 (C) Blindness defined. For purposes of this 6 subsection, an individual is blind only if his or her 7 central visual acuity does not exceed 20/200 in the 8 better eye with correcting lenses, or if his or her 9 visual acuity is greater than 20/200 but is 10 accompanied by a limitation in the fields of vision 11 such that the widest diameter of the visual fields 12 subtends an angle no greater than 20 degrees. 13 (d-5) Cost-of-living adjustment. For purposes of item (5) 14 of subsection (b), the cost-of-living adjustment for any 15 calendar year and for taxable years ending prior to the end of 16 the subsequent calendar year is equal to $2,050 times the 17 percentage (if any) by which: 18 (1) the Consumer Price Index for the preceding 19 calendar year, exceeds 20 (2) the Consumer Price Index for the calendar year 21 2011. 22 The Consumer Price Index for any calendar year is the 23 average of the Consumer Price Index as of the close of the 24 12-month period ending on August 31 of that calendar year. 25 The term "Consumer Price Index" means the last Consumer 26 Price Index for All Urban Consumers published by the United HB2979 - 4 - LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b HB2979- 5 -LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b HB2979 - 5 - LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b HB2979 - 5 - LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b 1 States Department of Labor or any successor agency. 2 If any cost-of-living adjustment is not a multiple of $25, 3 that adjustment shall be rounded to the next lowest multiple 4 of $25. 5 (e) Cross reference. See Article 3 for the manner of 6 determining base income allocable to this State. 7 (f) Application of Section 250. Section 250 does not apply 8 to the amendments to this Section made by Public Act 90-613. 9 (g) Notwithstanding any other provision of law, for 10 taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2017, no 11 taxpayer may claim an exemption under this Section if the 12 taxpayer's adjusted gross income for the taxable year exceeds 13 (i) $500,000, in the case of spouses filing a joint federal tax 14 return or (ii) $250,000, in the case of all other taxpayers. 15 (Source: P.A. 100-22, eff. 7-6-17; 100-865, eff. 8-14-18.) 16 Section 99. Effective date. This Act takes effect upon 17 becoming law. HB2979 - 5 - LRB103 29476 HLH 55871 b